Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB3031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 21, 2025
Analysis March 21, 2025
Fiscal Note March 21, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2025