House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1861 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 935 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 935 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |