Senate | 05/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1708 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |