Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB3039 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2025

                            By: West S.B. No. 3039
 (In the Senate - Filed April 4, 2025; April 7, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 30, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of students in public higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 51.4033 and 51.4034, Education Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.4033.  TRANSFER REPORT [OF NONTRANSFERABLE CREDIT].
 (a) Not later than May 1 of each year and in the form prescribed by
 the coordinating board, each general academic teaching institution
 shall provide to the coordinating board and the legislature a
 report that:
 (1)  describes [describing] any courses in the
 Lower-Division Academic Course Guide Manual or its successor
 adopted by the coordinating board for which a student who transfers
 to the institution from another institution of higher education is
 not granted:
 (A) [(1)]  academic credit at the receiving
 institution; or
 (B) [(2)]  if the student has declared a major and
 has not changed majors, academic credit toward the student's major
 at the receiving institution;
 (2)  details the institution's goals to increase the
 number, success, and persistence, as measured by the coordinating
 board, of students who transfer to the institution from a public
 junior college;
 (3)  assesses the institution's academic and technical
 transfer pathways;
 (4)  identifies:
 (A)  any existing barriers to transferring to the
 institution; and
 (B)  emerging issues affecting transfer students
 at the institution;
 (5)  details the institution's actions to serve current
 and prospective transfer students through local and regional
 articulation agreements that include:
 (A)  faculty collaboration;
 (B)  public junior college program enhancements;
 (C)  student outreach and advising services;
 (D)  website information development;
 (E)  targeted financial aid;
 (F)  student success programs; and
 (G)  degree program alignment; and
 (6)  contains any other information relating to the
 transfer of academic credit to the institution required by
 coordinating board rule.
 (b)  A report required by this section must indicate for each
 course described by Subsection (a)(1):
 (1)  the course name, [and] type, and common course
 number;
 (2)  the name of:
 (A)  the institution of higher education or other
 postsecondary educational institution at which the student
 completed the course; and
 (B)  the [which] institution of higher education
 that awarded or transcribed [provided] academic credit for the
 course; and
 (3)  the reason why the receiving institution did not
 grant academic credit for the course as described by Subsection
 (a), including whether the institution complied with the dispute
 resolution process under Section 61.826.
 (c)  Not later than September 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the coordinating board shall submit to the governor, the
 Legislative Budget Board, the house appropriations committee, and
 the senate finance committee a report that evaluates actions to
 increase the number, success, and persistence of students who
 transfer to a general academic teaching institution from a public
 junior college. The report must include:
 (1)  a comparative analysis of institution reports and
 performance data, including application and admission rates,
 financial aid awarded, time-to-degree, and baccalaureate
 graduation rates of students, including transfer students, by
 program completion at public junior colleges and general academic
 teaching institutions during the preceding academic year;
 (2)  a study of public junior college transfer
 practices; and
 (3)  recommendations for legislative or other action to
 meet the transfer student-related goals of the state's master plan
 for higher education developed under Section 61.051.
 (d)  The coordinating board may adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 Sec. 51.4034.  REPORT OF COURSES TAKEN AT PUBLIC JUNIOR
 COLLEGES. (a) Not later than May 1 of each year and in the form
 prescribed by the coordinating board, each public junior college
 shall provide to the coordinating board and the legislature a
 report on courses taken by students who, during the preceding
 academic year, transferred to a general academic teaching
 institution, completed a field of study curriculum, or earned an
 associate degree at the college.
 (b)  A report required by this section must include:
 (1)  the total number of:
 (A) [(1)]  courses attempted and completed at the
 college, including the total number of semester credit hours for
 those courses, disaggregated by whether the course is in:
 (i) [(A)]  the Workforce Education Course
 Manual or its successor adopted by the coordinating board; or
 (ii) [(B)]  the Lower-Division Academic
 Course Guide Manual or its successor adopted by the coordinating
 board;
 (B) [(2)]  courses attempted and completed at the
 college that are not in the recommended core curriculum developed
 by the coordinating board under Section 61.822; and
 (C) [(3)]  dual credit courses, including courses
 for joint high school and junior college credit under Section
 130.008, attempted and completed at the college; and
 (2)  any other relevant information required by
 coordinating board rule.
 (c)  The coordinating board may adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.4035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.4035.  PUBLICATION OF INFORMATION REGARDING DENIAL
 OF TRANSFER CREDIT. (a) Each institution of higher education shall
 maintain on the admissions page of the institution's Internet
 website a list of:
 (1)  the five majors or degree or certificate programs
 offered by the institution with the highest number of courses for
 which academic credit is denied or not applied toward the major or
 program; and
 (2)  the five courses for each major or degree or
 certificate program described by Subdivision (1) for which academic
 credit is most frequently denied because the credit is not
 applicable toward the major or program.
 (b)  The coordinating board annually shall provide to each
 institution of higher education a list of the courses described by
 Subsection (a)(2).
 (c)  The coordinating board may adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter S, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.8231 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.8231.  TRANSFER LIAISON. (a) Each institution of
 higher education, using existing resources, shall designate at
 least one employee of the institution to serve as a single point of
 contact for other institutions of higher education and the board
 regarding transfer issues and to act as a liaison officer for
 current or incoming students at the institution who will transfer
 into or out of the institution.
 (b)  On a transfer or request to transfer to or from an
 institution of higher education, the institution's transfer
 liaison shall provide a current, former, or prospective student, as
 applicable, with:
 (1)  a complete and current list of the institution's
 core curriculum applicable to the student;
 (2)  a complete and current list of the institution's
 field of study curricula that may be applicable to the student;
 (3)  for a receiving institution, a list of courses
 completed by the student:
 (A)  for which the institution will accept
 academic credit; and
 (B)  for which the institution proposes to deny
 academic credit in accordance with Section 61.826, including the
 procedures for credit transfer dispute required by that section;
 and
 (4)  any other information required by board rule.
 (c)  On the admission of a transfer student, the receiving
 institution of higher education's transfer liaison shall assist the
 student in obtaining a degree audit to determine whether the
 student's completed coursework satisfies the institution's core
 curriculum, satisfies a field of study curriculum of the
 institution, or qualifies the student to be awarded a Texas Direct
 associate degree under Section 61.834 or any other degree or
 certificate offered by the institution.
 (d)  The board shall adopt rules necessary to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2025-2026
 academic year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *