Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee