Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB3052 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/05/2025 10:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB9
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/05/2025 10:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB9
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
04/22/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
04/22/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee