Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/19/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/20/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Environmental Regulation: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/20/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/20/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/20/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 13 2025 4:44PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Elections: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Reported engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported enrolled: May 15 2025 8:58PM
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Referred to State Affairs