House | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1281 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1281 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1281 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1279 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1304 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 648 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |