House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 724 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1302 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1302 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Gutierrez | Journal Page: 1301 |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Creighton | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Postponed | 04/15/25 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 1300 |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Postponed 04/15/25 4:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1293 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |