2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed November 15, 2024; February 3, 2025, |
---|
3 | | - | read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government; |
---|
4 | | - | April 30, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, |
---|
5 | | - | Nays 0; April 30, 2025, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 3 | | |
---|
8 | 4 | | |
---|
9 | 5 | | |
---|
10 | 6 | | |
---|
11 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 9 | | relating to the continuation of a health care provider |
---|
14 | 10 | | participation program by the Harris County Hospital District. |
---|
15 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 299.004, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
17 | 13 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 14 | | Sec. 299.004. EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section |
---|
19 | 15 | | 299.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate |
---|
20 | 16 | | a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2025]. |
---|
21 | 17 | | (b) This chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2025]. |
---|
22 | 18 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
23 | 19 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
24 | 20 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
25 | 21 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
26 | 22 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|