Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB375 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2025

                            By: Miles S.B. No. 375
 (In the Senate - Filed November 15, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 30, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of a health care provider
 participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 299.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 299.004.  EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section
 299.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate
 a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2025].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2025].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *