Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1343 | Journal Page: 2725 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1155 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) | Journal Page: 2511 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 267 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 589 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 504 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 479 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 448 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 111 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 111 | |
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |