Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2024
Analysis November 21, 2024
Fiscal Note November 21, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis April 29, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 19, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 6, 2025
Analysis March 6, 2025
Fiscal Note March 6, 2025
Bill March 6, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2025
Analysis March 4, 2025
Analysis February 26, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2025
Bill March 6, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 5, 2025
Fiscal Note March 3, 2025