House | 05/05/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/10/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1030 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |