Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB458 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Schwertner, Blanco S.B. No. 458
2- Hughes
3-
4-
1+By: Schwertner S.B. No. 458
2+ (In the Senate - Filed November 22, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ April 2, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 2, 2025,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 458 By: Schwertner
59
610
711 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
812 AN ACT
913 relating to an appraisal process for disputed losses under personal
1014 automobile or residential property insurance policies.
1115 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1216 SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 10, Insurance Code, is amended
1317 by adding Chapter 1813 to read as follows:
1418 CHAPTER 1813. APPRAISAL OF DISPUTED LOSSES
1519 Sec. 1813.001. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) This chapter
1620 applies only to a personal automobile or residential property
1721 insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this
1822 state by an insurer, including:
1923 (1) a capital stock insurance company;
2024 (2) a mutual insurance company;
2125 (3) a county mutual insurance company;
2226 (4) a Lloyd's plan;
2327 (5) a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange;
2428 (6) a farm mutual insurance company;
2529 (7) an eligible surplus lines insurer if this state is
2630 the insured's home state as defined by Section 981.002; and
2731 (8) the FAIR Plan Association.
2832 (b) This chapter does not apply to:
2933 (1) an insurance policy delivered, issued for
3034 delivery, or renewed by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association;
3135 or
3236 (2) a commercial insurance policy.
3337 Sec. 1813.002. RULES. (a) The commissioner shall adopt
3438 rules necessary to implement this chapter, including:
3539 (1) rules establishing the period in which an
3640 appraisal under a provision required by this chapter must be
3741 completed; and
3842 (2) rules mandating an appraisal for total loss and
3943 damage of the property that is the subject of the appraisal.
4044 (b) In adopting rules establishing the period described by
4145 Subsection (a)(1), the commissioner must consider the
4246 qualifications and selection of appraisers and umpires for the
4347 appraisal.
4448 Sec. 1813.003. REQUIRED POLICY PROVISION: APPRAISAL
4549 PROCESS. (a) An insurance policy described by Section 1813.001(a)
4650 must contain an appraisal provision that complies with this
4751 chapter.
4852 (b) The appraisal provision required by this chapter is
4953 intended to provide a type of dispute resolution process solely to
5054 determine the amount of loss when that amount is in dispute between
5155 the policyholder and the insurer.
5256 Sec. 1813.004. EFFECT OF APPRAISAL. (a) An appraisal under
5357 the provision required by this chapter does not affect any
5458 applicable policy terms, and an appraisal award must be made in
5559 substantial compliance with the insurance policy.
5660 (b) Except for fraud, accident, or material mistake
5761 relevant to the appraisal or an appraisal award made without
5862 authority, the amount of loss determined by an appraisal under this
5963 chapter is binding as to the policyholder and the insurer.
6064 SECTION 2. (a) Chapter 1813, Insurance Code, as added by
6165 this Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for
6266 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2026.
6367 (b) An insurance policy form required to be filed under
6468 Chapter 2301, Insurance Code, providing for an appraisal process
6569 that is in use on September 1, 2025, and otherwise compliant with
6670 Chapter 1813, Insurance Code, as added by this Act, is not required
6771 to be filed with the Texas Department of Insurance as a consequence
6872 of this Act.
6973 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
74+ * * * * *