House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1575 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 504 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 233 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |