Senate | 05/05/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |