House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1639 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 121 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 121 | |
Senate | 12/02/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |