Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note December 5, 2024
Analysis December 5, 2024
Bill December 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 14, 2025
Witness List April 14, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note March 30, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 31, 2025