Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB528 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Schwertner S.B. No. 528
2+ (In the Senate - Filed December 5, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
4+ Services; April 14, 2025, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to inpatient competency restoration services.
914 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1015 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 7, Health and Safety Code, is
1116 amended by adding Chapter 580 to read as follows:
1217 CHAPTER 580. INPATIENT COMPETENCY RESTORATION SERVICES
1318 Sec. 580.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1419 (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
1520 Commission.
1621 (2) "Competency restoration" has the meaning assigned
1722 by Article 46B.001, Code of Criminal Procedure.
1823 (3) "Residential care facility" has the meaning
1924 assigned by Section 591.003.
2025 Sec. 580.002. APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies only to
2126 a facility that contracts with the commission to provide inpatient
2227 competency restoration services for an individual to stand trial in
2328 accordance with Chapter 46B, Code of Criminal Procedure.
2429 Sec. 580.003. MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING. The executive
2530 commissioner by rule shall require each facility to which this
2631 chapter applies to enter into a memorandum of understanding with
2732 the county and municipality in which the facility is located and
2833 each local mental health authority and local behavioral health
2934 authority that operates in the county or municipality, as
3035 applicable, to outline the respective powers and duties of the
3136 parties with respect to inpatient competency restoration services.
3237 Sec. 580.004. ANNUAL REPORT TO COMMISSION. (a) The
3338 commission shall require each facility to which this chapter
3439 applies to annually provide to the commission, in the form and
3540 manner the commission requires, the following information for the
3641 preceding year regarding individuals who received inpatient
3742 competency restoration services at the facility:
3843 (1) the total number of individuals who received
3944 inpatient competency restoration services at the facility and the
4045 number of those individuals who were restored to competency;
4146 (2) for those individuals who were restored to
4247 competency, the average number of days the individuals received
4348 services at the facility;
4449 (3) the number of individuals who were restored to
4550 competency after receiving services at the facility for not more
4651 than 60 days;
4752 (4) the number of individuals who were not restored to
4853 competency within the initial restoration period and for whom a
4954 treatment extension was sought;
5055 (5) the number of individuals who were not restored to
5156 competency and who were transferred to an inpatient mental health
5257 facility or residential care facility; and
5358 (6) for individuals who were not restored to
5459 competency, the average length of time between the date a
5560 determination was made that an individual was not restored to
5661 competency and the date the individual was transferred to an
5762 inpatient mental health facility or residential care facility.
5863 (b) The data in the report must be disaggregated by whether
5964 the individual was charged with a misdemeanor or felony offense and
6065 by any other appropriate demographic factors determined by the
6166 commission.
6267 Sec. 580.005. ANNUAL REPORT TO LEGISLATURE. Not later than
6368 September 1 of each year, the commission shall prepare and submit to
6469 the legislature a written report on inpatient competency
6570 restoration services in this state for the preceding year. The
6671 report must include:
6772 (1) a performance evaluation of each facility to which
6873 this chapter applies;
6974 (2) aggregated demographic data on individuals who
7075 received inpatient competency restoration services at a facility to
7176 which this chapter applies, including the criminal offenses the
7277 individuals were charged with, the individuals' countries of
7378 origin, and the individuals' diagnoses, if applicable; and
7479 (3) the overall cost of providing inpatient competency
7580 restoration services at a facility to which this chapter applies
7681 compared to the cost of:
7782 (A) providing forensic inpatient competency
7883 restoration services at a state hospital; and
7984 (B) other competency restoration programs
8085 managed by the commission.
8186 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 580.005, Health and
8287 Safety Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
8388 Commission is not required to submit the initial report required by
8489 that section until September 1, 2027.
8590 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
91+ * * * * *