Senate | 05/01/2025 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1689 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2439 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1116 | Journal Page: 2472 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1116 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1102 | Journal Page: 2438 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 2438 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended | 1-Shofner | Journal Page: 2437 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2437 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1705 | Journal Page: 2438 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1822 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1738 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1384 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1384 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1384 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1384 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |