Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2024
Analysis December 5, 2024
Fiscal Note December 5, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis April 29, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 9, 2025
Bill April 9, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note April 1, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2025
Bill April 9, 2025