House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 909 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 842 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/05/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |