House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1085 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1085 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 77 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 77 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |