Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB57 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Zaffirini, Campbell S.B. No. 57
2-
3-
1+By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 57
2+ (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
4+ March 17, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; March 17, 2025,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 57 By: Campbell
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to provisions and plans by public schools to ensure the
914 safety of individuals with disabilities or impairments during a
1015 mandatory school drill or a disaster or emergency situation.
1116 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1217 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
1318 amended by adding Section 29.0052 to read as follows:
1419 Sec. 29.0052. INCLUSION OF ACCOMMODATIONS DURING MANDATORY
1520 SCHOOL DRILLS IN INDIVIDUALIZED EDUCATION PROGRAM OR SECTION 504
1621 PLAN. (a) In this section:
1722 (1) "Committee" means a committee established under
1823 Section 29.005(a).
1924 (2) "Section 504 plan" means a plan created under
2025 Section 504, Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Section 794).
2126 (3) "Team" means a team established for a student
2227 under Section 504, Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Section
2328 794).
2429 (b) In developing or modifying an individualized education
2530 program or a Section 504 plan for a student, the student's committee
2631 or team, as applicable, shall consider whether the student's
2732 disabilities or impairments would require the school district to
2833 provide any specific accommodations for the student during a
2934 mandatory school drill required under Section 37.114. If the
3035 student's committee or team determines that the student would
3136 require a specific accommodation, the committee or team shall:
3237 (1) identify each disability or impairment that
3338 requires accommodation; and
3439 (2) for each disability or impairment identified under
3540 Subdivision (1), specify the required accommodations for that
3641 disability or impairment.
3742 (c) In making considerations and specifying required
3843 accommodations under Subsection (b), a committee or team must
3944 follow the guidelines established by the commissioner under Section
4045 37.1086.
4146 (d) A student's committee or team shall provide to each
4247 administrator with emergency planning responsibilities at the
4348 school district and campus at which the student is enrolled the
4449 information described by Subsections (b)(1) and (2).
4550 (e) A committee or team may invite school district and
4651 campus administrators with emergency planning responsibilities to
4752 assist the committee or team in making the considerations and
4853 specifying the required accommodations described by Subsection
4954 (b).
5055 SECTION 2. Section 37.108(f), Education Code, is amended to
5156 read as follows:
5257 (f) A school district shall include in its multihazard
5358 emergency operations plan:
5459 (1) a chain of command that designates the individual
5560 responsible for making final decisions during a disaster or
5661 emergency situation and identifies other individuals responsible
5762 for making those decisions if the designated person is unavailable;
5863 (2) provisions that address physical and
5964 psychological safety for responding to a natural disaster, active
6065 shooter, and any other dangerous scenario identified for purposes
6166 of this section by the agency or the Texas School Safety Center;
6267 (3) provisions for ensuring the safety of students in
6368 portable buildings;
6469 (4) provisions for ensuring that students and district
6570 personnel with disabilities are provided equal access to safety
6671 during a disaster or emergency situation based on the guidelines
6772 established by the commissioner under Section 37.1086;
6873 (5) provisions for providing immediate notification
6974 to parents, guardians, and other persons standing in parental
7075 relation in circumstances involving a significant threat to the
7176 health or safety of students, including identification of the
7277 individual with responsibility for overseeing the notification;
7378 (6) provisions for supporting the psychological
7479 safety of students, district personnel, and the community during
7580 the response and recovery phase following a disaster or emergency
7681 situation that:
7782 (A) are aligned with best practice-based
7883 programs and research-based practices recommended under Section
7984 38.351;
8085 (B) include strategies for ensuring any required
8186 professional development training for suicide prevention and
8287 grief-informed and trauma-informed care is provided to appropriate
8388 school personnel;
8489 (C) include training on integrating
8590 psychological safety and suicide prevention strategies into the
8691 district's plan, such as psychological first aid for schools
8792 training, from an approved list of recommended training established
8893 by the commissioner and Texas School Safety Center for:
8994 (i) members of the district's school safety
9095 and security committee under Section 37.109;
9196 (ii) district school counselors and mental
9297 health professionals; and
9398 (iii) educators and other district
9499 personnel as determined by the district;
95100 (D) include strategies and procedures for
96101 integrating and supporting physical and psychological safety that
97102 align with the provisions described by Subdivision (2); and
98103 (E) implement trauma-informed policies;
99104 (7) a policy for providing a substitute teacher access
100105 to school campus buildings and materials necessary for the
101106 substitute teacher to carry out the duties of a district employee
102107 during an emergency or a mandatory emergency drill;
103108 (8) the name of each individual on the district's
104109 school safety and security committee established under Section
105110 37.109 and the date of each committee meeting during the preceding
106111 year; and
107112 (9) certification that the district is in compliance
108113 with Section 37.117.
109114 SECTION 3. Section 37.1086, Education Code, is amended to
110115 read as follows:
111116 Sec. 37.1086. GUIDELINES FOR SCHOOL DRILL ACCOMMODATIONS
112117 AND MULTIHAZARD EMERGENCY OPERATIONS PLAN PROVISIONS FOR
113118 INDIVIDUALS WITH DISABILITIES OR IMPAIRMENTS. (a) The
114119 commissioner by rule [agency] shall establish guidelines for:
115120 (1) the considerations and specifications required
116121 under Section 29.0052 regarding accommodations for a student with
117122 an individualized education program or a plan created under Section
118123 504, Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Section 794); and
119124 (2) the provisions in a school district's multihazard
120125 emergency operations plan under Section 37.108(f)(4) to ensure the
121126 safety of students and district personnel with disabilities or
122127 impairments during a disaster or emergency situation.
123128 (b) In establishing guidelines under Subsection (a), the
124129 commissioner shall consult [, in consultation] with:
125130 (1) the Texas School Safety Center;
126131 (2) regional education service centers;
127132 (3) public school educators and administrators who
128133 work with students with disabilities or impairments; and
129134 (4) advocacy groups representing individuals with
130135 disabilities or impairments.
131136 (c) [(b)] A school district must follow the guidelines
132137 established by the commissioner [agency] under Subsection (a)(2)
133138 [(a)] in adopting and implementing the district's multihazard
134139 emergency operations plan under Section 37.108.
135140 SECTION 4. As soon as practicable after the effective date
136141 of this Act but not later than June 1, 2026, the commissioner of
137142 education shall adopt rules establishing the guidelines required by
138143 Section 37.1086, Education Code, as amended by this Act.
139144 SECTION 5. Section 29.0052, Education Code, as added by
140145 this Act, applies beginning with the 2026-2027 school year.
141146 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
142147 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
143148 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
144149 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
145150 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
151+ * * * * *