Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2024
Analysis December 13, 2024
Fiscal Note December 13, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 24, 2025
Analysis March 24, 2025
Fiscal Note March 24, 2025
Bill March 24, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2025
Analysis March 19, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2025
Bill March 24, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 20, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025