House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1409 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 845 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |