Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB605 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2024
Analysis December 13, 2024
Fiscal Note December 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 7, 2025
Analysis April 7, 2025
Fiscal Note April 7, 2025
Bill April 7, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 7, 2025
Analysis March 21, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 24, 2025