House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/10/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1327 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Menndez | Journal Page: 995 |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |