House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2033 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2033 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Sparks | Journal Page: 1433 |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Sparks | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 504 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 398 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |