House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1567 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1317 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1317 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1317 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1317 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |