House | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 504 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 482 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |