House | 05/07/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1775 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 12/17/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/17/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |