Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2024
Fiscal Note December 18, 2024
Analysis December 18, 2024

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Witness List April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note March 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025