Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB636 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/14/2025

                            By: Johnson S.B. No. 636
 (In the Senate - Filed December 18, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2;
 April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 636 By:  Hancock




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to coverage for mental health conditions and substance use
 disorders under certain governmental health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1355.002(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by this subchapter, but
 notwithstanding [Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1575 or
 1579 or] any other law, this subchapter [Section 1355.015] applies
 to:
 (1)  a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
 (2)  a basic plan under Chapter 1575; [and]
 (3) [(2)]  a primary care coverage plan under Chapter
 1579; and
 (4)  a plan providing basic coverage under Chapter
 1601.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1355.003(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  This subchapter does not apply to coverage under:
 (1)  a blanket accident and health insurance policy, as
 described by Chapter 1251;
 (2)  a short-term travel policy;
 (3)  an accident-only policy;
 (4)  a limited or specified-disease policy that does
 not provide benefits for mental health care or similar services;
 (5)  [except as provided by Subsection (b), a plan
 offered under Chapter 1551 or Chapter 1601;
 [(6)]  a plan offered in accordance with Section
 1355.151; or
 (6) [(7)]  a Medicare supplement benefit plan, as
 defined by Section 1652.002.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1355.015(e), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other law, this section does not
 apply to:
 (1)  a standard health benefit plan provided under
 Chapter 1507;
 (2)  a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551; or
 (3)  a plan providing basic coverage under Chapter
 1601.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1355.252, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other law, this subchapter applies
 to:
 (1)  a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
 (2)  a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
 (3)  a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
 and
 (4)  a plan providing basic coverage under Chapter
 1601.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1355.255, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1355.255.  COMPLIANCE.  (a)  Except as provided by
 Subsection (b), the [The] commissioner shall enforce compliance
 with Section 1355.254 by evaluating the benefits and coverage
 offered by a health benefit plan for quantitative and
 nonquantitative treatment limitations in the following categories:
 (1)  in-network and out-of-network inpatient care;
 (2)  in-network and out-of-network outpatient care;
 (3)  emergency care; and
 (4)  prescription drugs.
 (b)  With respect to a plan described by Section 1355.252(d),
 the applicable trustee, board of trustees, or system shall enforce
 compliance with Section 1355.254 by evaluating the benefits and
 coverage offered by a health benefit plan for quantitative and
 nonquantitative treatment limitations in the following categories:
 (1)  in-network and out-of-network inpatient care;
 (2)  in-network and out-of-network outpatient care;
 (3)  emergency care; and
 (4)  prescription drugs.
 SECTION 6.  Section 1551.205, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1551.205.  LIMITATIONS.  The board of trustees may not
 contract for or provide a coverage plan that:
 (1)  excludes or limits coverage or services for
 acquired immune deficiency syndrome, as defined by the Centers for
 Disease Control and Prevention of the United States Public Health
 Service, or human immunodeficiency virus infection; or
 (2)  [provides coverage for serious mental illness that
 is less extensive than the coverage provided for any physical
 illness; or
 [(3)]  may provide coverage for prescription drugs to
 assist in stopping smoking at a lower benefit level than is provided
 for other prescription drugs.
 SECTION 7.  Section 1355.003(b), Insurance Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a plan year that commences on or after January 1, 2026. A plan year
 that commenced before January 1, 2026, is governed by the law as it
 existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *