House | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 2634 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2634 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2461 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 134 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 134 | |
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |