Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2024
Analysis December 18, 2024
Fiscal Note December 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 16, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note April 9, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2025
Analysis April 8, 2025