House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/10/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |