2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2024; February 3, 2025, |
---|
| 3 | + | read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human |
---|
| 4 | + | Services; March 31, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | March 31, 2025, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 660 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 9 | | |
---|
5 | 10 | | |
---|
6 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
7 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
8 | 13 | | relating to the installation of bollards or another safety barrier |
---|
9 | 14 | | adjacent to certain hospital emergency rooms. |
---|
10 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 16 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter B, Chapter 311, Health |
---|
12 | 17 | | and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 18 | | SUBCHAPTER B. EMERGENCY SERVICES; EMERGENCY ROOMS |
---|
14 | 19 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 311, Health and Safety |
---|
15 | 20 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 311.025 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 21 | | Sec. 311.025. EMERGENCY ROOM CRASH BARRIERS REQUIRED AT |
---|
17 | 22 | | CERTAIN HOSPITALS. (a) In this section, "hospital" means a |
---|
18 | 23 | | hospital licensed under Chapter 241, except that the term does not |
---|
19 | 24 | | include a hospital that: |
---|
20 | 25 | | (1) is located in a county with a population of 68,750 |
---|
21 | 26 | | or less; or |
---|
22 | 27 | | (2) has been designated by the Centers for Medicare |
---|
23 | 28 | | and Medicaid Services as a critical access hospital, rural referral |
---|
24 | 29 | | center, or sole community hospital and: |
---|
25 | 30 | | (A) is not located in a metropolitan statistical |
---|
26 | 31 | | area; or |
---|
27 | 32 | | (B) if the hospital has 100 or fewer beds, is |
---|
28 | 33 | | located in a metropolitan statistical area. |
---|
29 | 34 | | (b) If a hospital maintains an emergency room located near |
---|
30 | 35 | | an area with vehicular traffic, the hospital shall install and |
---|
31 | 36 | | maintain crash-rated bollards or another similar safety barrier |
---|
32 | 37 | | adjacent to the emergency room in a manner likely to prevent a motor |
---|
33 | 38 | | vehicle from crashing into the emergency room. |
---|
34 | 39 | | (c) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
35 | 40 | | Services Commission shall adopt rules as necessary to implement |
---|
36 | 41 | | this section. |
---|
37 | 42 | | SECTION 3. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective |
---|
38 | 43 | | date of this Act but not later than December 1, 2025, the executive |
---|
39 | 44 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
40 | 45 | | adopt rules as required by Section 311.025(c), Health and Safety |
---|
41 | 46 | | Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
42 | 47 | | (b) A hospital to which Section 311.025, Health and Safety |
---|
43 | 48 | | Code, as added by this Act, applies: |
---|
44 | 49 | | (1) is not required to comply with the requirements of |
---|
45 | 50 | | that section until January 1, 2026; and |
---|
46 | 51 | | (2) is not required to reinstall or install additional |
---|
47 | 52 | | bollards or safety barriers if the hospital has, before the |
---|
48 | 53 | | effective date of this Act, installed crash-rated bollards or |
---|
49 | 54 | | another similar safety barrier adjacent to the hospital's emergency |
---|
50 | 55 | | room. |
---|
51 | 56 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|