Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB661 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/19/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R2663 MCF-F
 By: West S.B. No. 661




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Office of Youth Health and Safety.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 523, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter I to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER I.  OFFICE OF YOUTH HEALTH AND SAFETY
 Sec. 523.0401.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Board" means the Board of Youth Health and
 Safety.
 (2)  "Child" means an individual 10 years of age or
 older and younger than 18 years of age who is under the jurisdiction
 of a juvenile court.
 (3)  "Office" means the Office of Youth Health and
 Safety.
 Sec. 523.0402.  OFFICE OF YOUTH HEALTH AND SAFETY. The
 executive commissioner shall maintain an office of youth health and
 safety within the commission's Office of Forensic Coordination with
 the goal of:
 (1)  promoting trauma-responsive and culturally
 informed services for children engaging in delinquent conduct in a
 manner that supports the child's successful transition to
 adulthood; and
 (2)  ensuring children become responsible, thriving,
 and engaged members of their communities.
 Sec. 523.0403.  COMPOSITION OF BOARD; PRESIDING OFFICER.
 (a)  The board is the governing body of the office.
 (b)  The board is composed of the following 21 members or
 their designees:
 (1)  the executive commissioner;
 (2)  the chief officer of the commission's Medicaid and
 CHIP services division;
 (3)  the deputy executive commissioner of the
 Intellectual and Developmental Disability and Behavioral Health
 Services Department;
 (4)  the director of the Early Childhood Education
 Division at the Texas Education Agency;
 (5)  the following members appointed by the executive
 commissioner:
 (A)  a member of the judiciary;
 (B)  an attorney with experience in defending
 civil rights cases;
 (C)  a member of the Texas Judicial Commission on
 Mental Health;
 (D)  a faculty member from the medical school at
 The University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio;
 (E)  a licensed trauma-informed youth counselor;
 (F)  an education advocate;
 (G)  two culturally responsive juvenile justice
 advocates;
 (H)  a culturally responsive youth mental health
 advocate;
 (I)  a harm reduction advocate; and
 (J)  a representative of the Texas Correctional
 Office on Offenders with Medical or Mental Impairments; and
 (6)  the following members appointed by the executive
 commissioner from recommendations made by the presiding officer:
 (A)  a child welfare advocate;
 (B)  two youth advocates;
 (C)  two individuals formerly committed to a
 juvenile secure correctional facility who are able to serve as
 credible messengers for detained youth; and
 (D)  a mitigation specialist.
 (c)  Board members appointed under Subsections (b)(5) and
 (6) serve staggered six-year terms, with the terms of five or six
 members expiring on February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall designate a member of
 the board as the presiding officer to serve in that capacity at the
 pleasure of the executive commissioner.
 Sec. 523.0404.  PLAN. (a) The office shall develop a plan to
 improve the juvenile justice system under the authority of the
 office.
 (b)  The plan must include a detailed list of procedures and
 strategies to:
 (1)  not later than September 1, 2028:
 (A)  end commitments of children to
 post-adjudication secure correctional facilities operated by the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department;
 (B)  significantly reduce the population of
 children currently committed to post-adjudication secure
 correctional facilities operated by the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department;
 (C)  establish infrastructure in each county in
 this state to provide alternative services related to delinquency
 prevention and intervention, including alternative evidence-based
 safe, local, and supportive placements for children who are not
 able to stay at home;
 (D)  establish secure placement options for
 children who are determined by a court to present a serious risk of
 harm to self or others;
 (E)  increase local, evidence-based delinquency
 responses and interventions in communities and schools; and
 (F)  end racial and disability disparities for
 children in the juvenile justice system; and
 (2)  conduct a study on the feasibility of a staggered
 closure of all post-adjudication secure correctional facilities
 operated by the Texas Juvenile Justice Department.
 (c)  In developing the plan, the office shall consult with
 experts and interested parties, including juvenile probation
 departments.
 (d)  Not later than January 1, 2027, the office shall submit
 a copy of the plan to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and each member of the
 legislature.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2032.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than the 60th day after the effective
 date of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall appoint members to the Board of Youth
 Health and Safety in accordance with Section 523.0403, Government
 Code, as added by this Act. In appointing the initial members of
 the board under this section, the executive commissioner shall
 designate six members for terms expiring February 1, 2027, six
 members for terms expiring February 1, 2029, and five members for
 terms expiring February 1, 2031.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.