Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note December 19, 2024
Analysis December 19, 2024
Bill December 19, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2025
Fiscal Note April 3, 2025
Analysis April 3, 2025
Witness List April 3, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 1, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 28, 2025