House | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 136 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 136 | |
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |