House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1635 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 647 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 136 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 136 | |
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |