E | 05/09/2025 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1933 | |
House | 05/09/2025 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/09/2025 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1925 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1888 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Record vote | RV#1750 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Record vote RV#1750 | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1651 | Journal Page: 3164 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3162 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2776 | Journal Page: 3162 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 504 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 422 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 400 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 01/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |