Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB703 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2025
Analysis January 3, 2025
Fiscal Note January 3, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis May 5, 2025
Bill May 5, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 4, 2025
Bill March 4, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2025
Analysis February 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2025
Bill March 4, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note February 17, 2025