House | 05/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2754 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 447 | |
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 01/06/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/06/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |