House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 J. Hinojosa | Journal Page: 735 |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 01/10/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/10/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |