Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB761 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2025
Analysis January 10, 2025
Fiscal Note January 10, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note March 26, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 19, 2025
Analysis March 19, 2025
Fiscal Note March 19, 2025
Bill March 19, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note March 18, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 19, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 18, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025