Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1495 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 4952 | Journal Page: 2844 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2647 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 1575 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |