Senate | 04/30/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 983 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 761 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 211 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 211 | |
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |